Senate | 05/10/2011 | Referred to Education | Journal Page: 2188 | |
Senate | 05/10/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2188 | |
Senate | 05/09/2011 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2071 | |
House | 05/07/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3300 | |
House | 05/06/2011 | Record vote | RV#807 | Journal Page: 3119 |
House | 05/06/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 3119 | |
House | 05/06/2011 | Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3118 | |
House | 05/06/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3118 | |
House | 05/05/2011 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 3075 | |
House | 05/05/2011 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 3075 | |
House | 05/05/2011 | Postponed | 5/5/11 8:30 PM | Journal Page: 3074 |
House | 05/05/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3074 | |
House | 05/05/2011 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/03/2011 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/28/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/27/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/27/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2391 | |
House | 04/26/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/26/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/12/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/12/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/12/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/12/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/16/2011 | Referred to Public Education | Journal Page: 819 | |
House | 03/16/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 819 | |
House | 03/09/2011 | Filed |