House
|
05/27/2011
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6281
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6281
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 4326
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
Senate grants request for conference comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 4326
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4085
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4085
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4085
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 5972
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 5972
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 5972
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5045
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3312
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3312
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3312
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3312
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3312
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3312
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3312
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA9 Carona
|
Journal Page: 3311
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 3311
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Postponed
|
|
Journal Page: 3131
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Amendment adopted as amended
|
FA3 Watson
|
Journal Page: 3129
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Amendment amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3129
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Amendment to amendment offered
|
FA4 Watson
|
Journal Page: 3128
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3127
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 3126
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2710
|
Senate
|
05/18/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2011
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 2266
|
Senate
|
05/12/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2266
|
Senate
|
05/12/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2236
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3968
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3559
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#965
|
Journal Page: 3558
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3558
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Amended
|
3-Smithee
|
Journal Page: 3557
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 3557
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Postponed
|
5/11/11 1:00 PM
|
Journal Page: 3546
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3546
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3392
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3392
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Amended
|
46-L. Taylor
|
Journal Page: 3391
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
45-Martinez Fischer
|
Journal Page: 3382
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#930
|
Journal Page: 3381
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Amendment tabled
|
43-Rodriguez
|
Journal Page: 3381
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Amendment fails of adoption
|
28-Deshotel
|
Journal Page: 3374
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3371
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3371
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Point of order overruled
|
Rule 8, Section 5(b)
|
Journal Page: 3360
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Amendment to amendment tabled
|
4-Eiland and L. Taylor
|
Journal Page: 3354
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
3-Smithee
|
Journal Page: 3352
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Amendment to amendment withdrawn
|
2-Eiland and L. Taylor
|
Journal Page: 3351
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 3350
|
House
|
05/09/2011
|
Postponed
|
5/9/11 7:00 PM
|
Journal Page: 3206
|
House
|
05/09/2011
|
Point of order withdrawn
|
|
Journal Page: 3206
|
House
|
05/09/2011
|
Resumed consideration
|
|
Journal Page: 3206
|
House
|
05/07/2011
|
Point of order
|
Rule 4, Section 32(c)
|
Journal Page: 3201
|
House
|
05/07/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3201
|
House
|
05/06/2011
|
Placed on Major State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2391
|
House
|
04/12/2011
|
Vote reconsidered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2011
|
Referred to Insurance
|
|
Journal Page: 746
|
House
|
03/10/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 746
|
House
|
03/10/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|