E
|
06/17/2011
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6919
|
E
|
05/23/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5399
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2969
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4761
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5048
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4222
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2562
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2562
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2562
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2562
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2562
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2562
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2562
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2011
|
Corrected comm. report printed & distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2195
|
Senate
|
05/10/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2011
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 1918
|
Senate
|
05/05/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1918
|
Senate
|
05/04/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1741
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3092
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2686
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2684
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#630
|
Journal Page: 2686
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2686
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2686
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2670
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2670
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2011
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2391
|
House
|
04/20/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2011
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2011
|
Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
|
|
Journal Page: 821
|
House
|
03/16/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 821
|
House
|
03/09/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|