E
|
06/17/2011
|
Effective on 9/1/11
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6919
|
E
|
05/26/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6284
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3773
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5417
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5763
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5044
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3114
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3114
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3114
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3113
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3113
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3113
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 3113
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2612
|
Senate
|
05/18/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2011
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
Journal Page: 2145
|
Senate
|
05/09/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2145
|
Senate
|
05/05/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1767
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3178
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2835
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#686
|
Journal Page: 2835
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2835
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2835
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2757
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2757
|
House
|
05/02/2011
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2005
|
House
|
04/13/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2011
|
Referred to Corrections
|
|
Journal Page: 822
|
House
|
03/16/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 822
|
House
|
03/09/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|