House | 05/12/2011 | 1 hr. notice-for reconsideration | Journal Page: 3690 | |
House | 05/12/2011 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3678 | |
House | 05/12/2011 | Record vote | RV#993 | Journal Page: 3677 |
House | 05/12/2011 | Failed to pass | Journal Page: 3677 | |
House | 05/12/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3677 | |
House | 05/11/2011 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3590 | |
House | 05/11/2011 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 3590 | |
House | 05/11/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3590 | |
House | 05/06/2011 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/04/2011 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/21/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/20/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/20/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2171 | |
House | 04/19/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/19/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/12/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/12/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/12/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/12/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/16/2011 | Referred to Public Education | Journal Page: 823 | |
House | 03/16/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 823 | |
House | 03/09/2011 | Filed |