E
|
06/01/2011
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/01/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6917
|
E
|
05/27/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6459
|
E
|
05/27/2011
|
Sent to the Comptroller
|
|
Journal Page: 6460
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
Signed in Senate-Art III Sec 49a Tx. Const.
|
|
Journal Page: 4373
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6275
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6459
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5959
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3703
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 3703
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Ordered not printed
|
|
Journal Page: 3703
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Printing rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3703
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3703
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Reason for vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5476
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5476
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Subject to Art.III Sec.49a Tx. Constitution
|
|
Journal Page: 5476
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 5475
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 3518
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5047
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5047
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 3148
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Senate grants request for conference comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 3148
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2619
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2619
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2619
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 4328
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4328
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1182
|
Journal Page: 4327
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Motion fails
|
|
Journal Page: 4327
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Motion to instruct conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 4327
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 4327
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4327
|
House
|
05/19/2011
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 4327
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2011
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4061
|
Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2371
|
Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2371
|
Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2371
|
Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2370
|
Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2370
|
Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2370
|
Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
|
Journal Page: 2370
|
Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA2 West
|
Journal Page: 2370
|
Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
Amendment tabled
|
|
Journal Page: 2370
|
Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2369
|
Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2369
|
Senate
|
05/13/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2269
|
Senate
|
05/12/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2011
|
Referred to Finance
|
|
Journal Page: 897
|
Senate
|
04/04/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 897
|
Senate
|
04/04/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 870
|
House
|
04/01/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1463
|
House
|
04/01/2011
|
Subject to Art.III Sec.49a Tx. Constitution
|
|
Journal Page: 1232
|
House
|
04/01/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#212
|
Journal Page: 1231
|
House
|
04/01/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1231
|
House
|
04/01/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1231
|
House
|
03/31/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
HB 275 and amendments
|
Journal Page: 1221
|
House
|
03/31/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#209
|
Journal Page: 1220
|
House
|
03/31/2011
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1220
|
House
|
03/31/2011
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
21-Alonzo
|
Journal Page: 1220
|
House
|
03/31/2011
|
Amendment as amended tabled
|
19-Gutierrez
|
Journal Page: 1219
|
House
|
03/31/2011
|
Amendment amended
|
20-Gutierrez
|
Journal Page: 1219
|
House
|
03/31/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
19-Gutierrez
|
Journal Page: 1218
|
House
|
03/31/2011
|
Amendment tabled
|
18-Turner
|
Journal Page: 1216
|
House
|
03/31/2011
|
Amendment adopted as amended
|
6-Zedler
|
Journal Page: 1207
|
House
|
03/31/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1199
|
House
|
03/31/2011
|
Placed on Major State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1121
|
House
|
03/30/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#161
|
Journal Page: 1120
|
House
|
03/30/2011
|
Rules suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1120
|
House
|
03/23/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#151
|
Journal Page: 1042
|
House
|
03/23/2011
|
Calendars Committee rule adopted
|
|
Journal Page: 1042
|
House
|
03/23/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1072
|
House
|
03/15/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2011
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 741
|
House
|
03/10/2011
|
Meeting cancelled
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2011
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 734
|
House
|
03/01/2011
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
Journal Page: 550
|
House
|
03/01/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 550
|
House
|
02/28/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|