H.B. No. 275 AN ACT relating to making an appropriation of money from the economic stabilization fund for expenditure during the current state fiscal biennium. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. (a) The amount of $3,198,661,120 is appropriated from the economic stabilization fund to the comptroller of public accounts for the purpose of depositing that amount to the credit of the general revenue fund as money available for use during the state fiscal year ending August 31, 2011, to make expenditures previously authorized by appropriations from general revenue for the state fiscal biennium ending August 31, 2011. (b) This Act takes effect only if it receives a vote of three-fifths of the members present in each house of the legislature, as provided by Section 49-g(k), Article III, Texas Constitution, and is subject to certification by the comptroller of public accounts as provided by that subsection. SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately. ______________________________ ______________________________ President of the Senate Speaker of the House I certify that H.B. No. 275 was passed by the House on April 1, 2011, by the following vote: Yeas 147, Nays 1, 1 present, not voting; that the House refused to concur in Senate amendments to H.B. No. 275 on May 19, 2011, and requested the appointment of a conference committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and that the House adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No. 275 on May 25, 2011, by the following vote: Yeas 123, Nays 21, 2 present, not voting; passed subject to the provisions of Article III, Section 49a, of the Constitution of the State of Texas. ______________________________ Chief Clerk of the House I certify that H.B. No. 275 was passed by the Senate, with amendments, on May 16, 2011, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays 1; at the request of the House, the Senate appointed a conference committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and that the Senate adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No. 275 on May 25, 2011, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0; passed subject to the provisions of Article III, Section 49a, of the Constitution of the State of Texas. ______________________________ Secretary of the Senate I certify that the amounts appropriated in the herein H.B. No. 275, Regular Session of the 82nd Legislature, are within amounts estimated to be available in the affected fund. Certified_____________________ ______________________________ Comptroller of Public Accounts APPROVED: __________________ Date __________________ Governor