Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB2758 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Pena (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini) H.B. No. 2758
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 4, 2011;
 May 5, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on Higher
 Education; May 19, 2011, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 19, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to mandatory emergency alert systems at institutions of
 higher education.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter E, Chapter 51, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 51.218 to read as follows:
 Sec. 51.218.  EMERGENCY ALERT SYSTEM. (a)  In this section,
 "institution of higher education" and "private or independent
 institution of higher education" have the meanings assigned by
 Section 61.003.
 (b)  Each institution of higher education and private or
 independent institution of higher education shall establish an
 emergency alert system for the institution's students and staff,
 including faculty. The emergency alert system must use e-mail or
 telephone notifications in addition to any other alert method the
 institution considers appropriate to provide timely notification
 of emergencies affecting the institution or its students and staff.
 (c)  At the time a student initially enrolls or registers for
 courses or a staff member begins employment, the institution shall:
 (1)  obtain a personal telephone number or e-mail
 address from the student or staff member to be used to notify the
 individual in the event of an emergency; and
 (2)  register the student or staff member in the
 institution's emergency alert system.
 (d)  A student or staff member may elect not to participate
 in an emergency alert system established under this section. An
 election under this subsection may be submitted electronically or
 in writing, as chosen by the institution, and must be renewed at the
 start of each academic year.
 (e)  The personal identifying information obtained from an
 individual for the purpose of the emergency alert system of an
 institution of higher education, including an e-mail address or
 telephone number, is confidential and not subject to disclosure
 under Section 552.021, Government Code.
 (f)  Each institution of higher education and private or
 independent institution of higher education shall implement the
 emergency alert system required by this section not later than the
 spring 2012 semester.  This subsection expires June 1, 2012.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *