E
|
06/17/2011
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6919
|
E
|
05/30/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6917
|
Senate
|
05/30/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5147
|
House
|
05/30/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6913
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6916
|
Senate
|
05/26/2011
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3798
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5780
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1517
|
Journal Page: 5780
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5780
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5040
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3031
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3031
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3031
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3031
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3031
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3031
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 3031
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 3318
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2711
|
Senate
|
05/18/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2369
|
Senate
|
04/27/2011
|
Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
|
|
Journal Page: 1373
|
Senate
|
04/27/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1373
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1298
|
House
|
04/21/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2264
|
House
|
04/20/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2060
|
House
|
04/20/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#488
|
Journal Page: 2059
|
House
|
04/20/2011
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2059
|
House
|
04/20/2011
|
Amended
|
1-Farrar
|
Journal Page: 2059
|
House
|
04/20/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2059
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1990
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1990
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1990
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1662
|
House
|
04/04/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2011
|
Referred to Business & Industry
|
|
Journal Page: 826
|
House
|
03/16/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 826
|
House
|
03/09/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|