Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB2785 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: J. Davis of Harris, Reynolds, Murphy H.B. No. 2785
 (Senate Sponsor - Shapiro
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 11, 2011;
 April 26, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Economic Development; May 5, 2011, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 5, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the creation of the Select Committee on Economic
 Development.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  PURPOSE. The purpose of this Act is to ensure
 that economic development initiatives in this state are effective
 in encouraging new investment, employment, and income and in
 retaining existing facilities and employment.  The economic
 development incentives must be appropriately sized and directed and
 administratively efficient and must allow this state to compete
 with other states.  It is the intent of the legislature to develop
 objective criteria to evaluate the state's economic development
 initiatives that reflect sound economic principles appropriately
 applied in light of the diverse nature of the initiatives and the
 state's economy.
 SECTION 2.  DEFINITION. In this Act, "committee" means the
 Select Committee on Economic Development.
 SECTION 3.  COMPOSITION. (a) The Select Committee on
 Economic Development is composed of 12 members as follows:
 (1)  four public members appointed by the governor:
 (A)  two of whom must be owners or employees of a
 business with significant operations in this state; and
 (B)  one of whom must be a member of the governing
 body of a municipality or county;
 (2)  two public members appointed by the lieutenant
 governor, one of whom must be an owner or employee of a business
 with significant operations in this state;
 (3)  two members of the senate appointed by the
 lieutenant governor;
 (4)  two public members appointed by the speaker of the
 house of representatives, one of whom must be an owner or employee
 of a business with significant operations in this state; and
 (5)  two members of the house of representatives
 appointed by the speaker of the house of representatives.
 (b)  Each individual required to make an appointment under
 Subsection (a) of this section shall make the appointment as soon as
 possible after the effective date of this Act, but not later than
 November 1, 2011.
 SECTION 4.  PRESIDING OFFICER; MEETINGS.  (a)  The governor
 shall select the presiding officer of the committee from among the
 committee members.
 (b)  The committee shall meet at the call of the presiding
 officer.
 SECTION 5.  COMMITTEE DUTIES. The committee shall:
 (1)  recommend to the legislature an economic
 development policy for the state;
 (2)  conduct a study and make recommendations to the
 legislature regarding state and local economic development
 incentives;
 (3)  develop criteria for evaluating the effectiveness
 of existing economic development policies and incentives in this
 state and make recommendations the committee considers necessary to
 improve those policies and incentives, taking into account:
 (A)  aspects of the state and local tax systems
 that encourage or hinder economic activity in the state;
 (B)  the types or categories of businesses
 eligible for incentives and whether the promotion or encouragement
 of a specific type or category of business activity is in the best
 long-term interest of the state and the citizens of this state;
 (C)  the extent to which an incentive should
 encourage the maintenance or expansion of existing capital
 investment within this state or attract new capital investment from
 outside this state;
 (D)  the extent to which an incentive should
 encourage the retention or expansion of existing employment within
 this state or encourage the creation of additional employment,
 either at existing or new business locations in this state;
 (E)  the direct effects of the business activity
 qualifying for the incentive and the indirect and induced effects
 associated with that activity on capital investment, employment,
 wages, salaries, state and local tax revenues, and demands for
 state or local public services;
 (F)  how the incentives offered in this state
 compare to those available in other states or countries, and how
 those differences affect business decisions to invest in this state
 or outside this state; and
 (G)  whether and to what extent a particular
 incentive should take the form of a direct grant of state or local
 revenue, the abatement, deferral, or limitation of a state or local
 tax, fee, or assessment, the provision of a specific service or
 program designed to benefit the business, or other direct or
 indirect financing mechanism;
 (4)  consider the benefits of consolidating state and
 local economic development incentives into a single statewide
 office or agency;
 (5)  evaluate existing state or local economic
 development incentives and make recommendations regarding the
 continuation, elimination, or modification of those incentives
 based on the criteria developed under Subdivision (3) of this
 section; and
 (6)  make recommendations on whether the state should
 adopt new incentives to better accomplish the state's economic
 development policy.
 SECTION 6.  REPORT. Not later than January 1, 2013, the
 committee shall submit a report of the committee's findings,
 studies, and recommendations to:
 (1)  the governor;
 (2)  the lieutenant governor;
 (3)  the speaker of the house of representatives; and
 (4)  each member of the legislature.
 SECTION 7.  STAFF. On the committee's request, the
 Legislative Budget Board, Texas Legislative Council, office of the
 governor, senate, and house of representatives shall provide the
 staff necessary to assist the committee in performing its duties.
 SECTION 8.  COOPERATION OF STATE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT, OR
 OFFICE. If needed to perform the duties of the committee, the
 committee may request the assistance of a state agency, department,
 or office. The state agency, department, or office shall provide
 the committee with the requested assistance.
 SECTION 9.  EXPENSES. (a) The operating expenses of the
 committee shall be paid from available funds of the office of the
 governor, the senate, and the house of representatives, as agreed
 to by those entities.
 (b)  When attending committee meetings, a public member of
 the committee shall be allowed the same mileage and per diem as are
 allowed members of the legislature who attend a committee meeting
 when the legislature is not in session.
 SECTION 10.  EXPIRATION DATE.  The committee is abolished
 and this Act expires September 1, 2013.
 SECTION 11.  EFFECTIVE DATE.  This Act takes effect
 September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *