Senate | 04/27/2011 | Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec. | Journal Page: 1373 | |
Senate | 04/27/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1373 | |
Senate | 04/26/2011 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1299 | |
House | 04/25/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2264 | |
House | 04/21/2011 | Record vote | RV#503 | Journal Page: 2149 |
House | 04/21/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 2149 | |
House | 04/21/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2149 | |
House | 04/21/2011 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2140 | |
House | 04/21/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2140 | |
House | 04/21/2011 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/18/2011 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/14/2011 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/13/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/13/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1835 | |
House | 04/04/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/04/2011 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/04/2011 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/04/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/28/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/28/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/28/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/23/2011 | No action taken in committee | ||
House | 03/23/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/16/2011 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 828 | |
House | 03/16/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 828 | |
House | 03/09/2011 | Filed |