Senate | 05/10/2011 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 2188 | |
Senate | 05/10/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2188 | |
Senate | 05/09/2011 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2071 | |
House | 05/07/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3300 | |
House | 05/06/2011 | Record vote | RV#814 | Journal Page: 3125 |
House | 05/06/2011 | Passed as amended | Journal Page: 3125 | |
House | 05/06/2011 | Amended | 1-Zedler | Journal Page: 3125 |
House | 05/06/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3125 | |
House | 05/05/2011 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3080 | |
House | 05/05/2011 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 3080 | |
House | 05/05/2011 | Amended | 2-Hartnett | Journal Page: 3079 |
House | 05/05/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3078 | |
House | 05/05/2011 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/03/2011 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/27/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/27/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/26/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2323 | |
House | 04/18/2011 | Reported favorably as amended | ||
House | 04/18/2011 | Amendment(s) considered in committee | ||
House | 04/18/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/11/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/11/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/11/2011 | Amendment(s) considered in committee | ||
House | 04/11/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/11/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/08/2011 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 1633 | |
House | 03/16/2011 | Referred to Elections | Journal Page: 828 | |
House | 03/16/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 828 | |
House | 03/09/2011 | Filed |