Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB282 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Flynn, Guillen (Senate Sponsor - Van de Putte) H.B. No. 282
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 11, 2011;
 April 26, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Veteran Affairs and Military Installations; May 12, 2011, reported
 favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 12, 2011,
 sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to an analysis by the adjutant general of facility needs of
 state military forces before grants or conveyances of real
 property.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 431.0301(c), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (c)  The adjutant general may:
 (1)  hold, manage, or maintain the property;
 (2)  after the analysis required under Section
 431.0308, if applicable, lease[,] or sell the property; and
 (3)  [may] pledge all or part of the rents, issues, and
 profits of the property.
 SECTION 2.  Section 431.0303(a), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (a)  After the analysis required under Section 431.0308, if
 applicable, the [The] adjutant general may lease property to any
 person under terms the adjutant general determines.
 SECTION 3.  Section 431.0305(a), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (a)  When property that the adjutant general owns or that is
 transferred to the state under Section 431.0304 is fully paid for
 and free of liens, and all obligations incurred in connection with
 the acquisition and construction of the property have been fully
 paid, the adjutant general may, after conducting the analysis
 required under Section 431.0308, if applicable, properly dispose of
 the property if:
 (1)  the property is designated by the adjutant general
 as surplus; and
 (2)  the disposal is in the best interests of the
 adjutant general and the state military forces and its components
 or successors.
 SECTION 4.  Subchapter B, Chapter 431, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 431.0308 to read as follows:
 Sec. 431.0308.  ANALYSIS OF FACILITY SPACE BEFORE REAL
 PROPERTY GRANT OR CONVEYANCE. Before granting or conveying an
 interest in real property under this subchapter, the adjutant
 general must conduct an analysis evaluating whether each unit of
 the state military forces has adequate facility space to ensure
 that ongoing operations are maintained.
 SECTION 5.  The changes in law made by this Act apply only to
 a grant or conveyance of an interest in real property that occurs on
 or after the effective date of this Act. For the purposes of this
 section, a grant or conveyance of an interest in real property
 occurs before the effective date of this Act if the adjutant general
 is bound by contract before that date to make the grant or
 conveyance.
 SECTION 6.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *