Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB2851 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Mallory Caraway (Senate Sponsor - Rodriguez) H.B. No. 2851
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 4, 2011;
 May 5, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on Veteran
 Affairs and Military Installations; May 12, 2011, reported
 favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 12, 2011, sent
 to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to deferral of certain surcharge payments for military
 personnel deployed outside of the continental United States.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter C, Chapter 708, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 708.106 to read as follows:
 Sec. 708.106.  DEFERRAL OF SURCHARGES FOR DEPLOYED MILITARY
 PERSONNEL.  The department by rule shall establish a deferral
 program for surcharges assessed under Section 708.103 or 708.104
 against a person who is a member of the United States armed forces
 on active duty deployed outside of the continental United States.
 The program must:
 (1)  toll the 36-month period while the person is
 deployed; and
 (2)  defer assessment of surcharges against the person
 until the date the person is no longer deployed for an offense
 committed:
 (A)  before the person was deployed; or
 (B)  while the person is deployed.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *