House | 05/11/2011 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 3604 | |
House | 05/11/2011 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB 316 | Journal Page: 3593 |
House | 05/06/2011 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/04/2011 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/28/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/28/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/27/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2390 | |
House | 04/05/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/05/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/29/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/29/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/29/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/29/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/17/2011 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 848 | |
House | 03/17/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 848 | |
House | 03/10/2011 | Filed |