1 | 1 | | By: Harper-Brown (Senate Sponsor - Ellis) H.B. No. 2866 |
---|
2 | 2 | | (In the Senate - Received from the House April 19, 2011; |
---|
3 | 3 | | April 20, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on |
---|
4 | 4 | | Government Organization; May 5, 2011, reported favorably by the |
---|
5 | 5 | | following vote: Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 5, 2011, sent to printer.) |
---|
6 | 6 | | |
---|
7 | 7 | | |
---|
8 | 8 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
9 | 9 | | AN ACT |
---|
10 | 10 | | relating to the electronic submission of certain documents to the |
---|
11 | 11 | | attorney general and the submission of certain documents by the |
---|
12 | 12 | | attorney general; imposing certain fees. |
---|
13 | 13 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
14 | 14 | | SECTION 1. Section 402.006, Government Code, is amended by |
---|
15 | 15 | | adding Subsection (d) to read as follows: |
---|
16 | 16 | | (d) The attorney general may charge and collect a |
---|
17 | 17 | | nonrefundable administrative convenience fee for the electronic |
---|
18 | 18 | | submission of a document to the attorney general. The fee |
---|
19 | 19 | | authorized by this section is in addition to any other fee the |
---|
20 | 20 | | attorney general may assess. The attorney general may adopt rules |
---|
21 | 21 | | necessary to administer this subsection. This subsection expires |
---|
22 | 22 | | September 1, 2015. |
---|
23 | 23 | | SECTION 2. Subchapter G, Chapter 552, Government Code, is |
---|
24 | 24 | | amended by adding Section 552.309 to read as follows: |
---|
25 | 25 | | Sec. 552.309. TIMELINESS OF ACTION BY ELECTRONIC |
---|
26 | 26 | | SUBMISSION. (a) When this subchapter requires a request, notice, |
---|
27 | 27 | | or other document to be submitted or otherwise given to the attorney |
---|
28 | 28 | | general within a specified period, the requirement is met in a |
---|
29 | 29 | | timely fashion if the document is submitted to the attorney general |
---|
30 | 30 | | through the attorney general's designated electronic filing system |
---|
31 | 31 | | within that period. |
---|
32 | 32 | | (b) The attorney general may electronically transmit a |
---|
33 | 33 | | notice, decision, or other document. When this subchapter requires |
---|
34 | 34 | | the attorney general to deliver a notice, decision, or other |
---|
35 | 35 | | document within a specified period, the requirement is met in a |
---|
36 | 36 | | timely fashion if the document is electronically transmitted by the |
---|
37 | 37 | | attorney general within that period. |
---|
38 | 38 | | (c) This section does not affect the right of a person or |
---|
39 | 39 | | governmental body to submit information to the attorney general |
---|
40 | 40 | | under Section 552.308. |
---|
41 | 41 | | SECTION 3. The fee prescribed by Section 402.006(d), |
---|
42 | 42 | | Government Code, as added by this Act, applies only to a document |
---|
43 | 43 | | electronically submitted to the office of the attorney general on |
---|
44 | 44 | | or after the effective date of this Act. |
---|
45 | 45 | | SECTION 4. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
46 | 46 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
47 | 47 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
48 | 48 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
49 | 49 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2011. |
---|
50 | 50 | | * * * * * |
---|