E
|
06/17/2011
|
Vetoed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6919
|
E
|
05/26/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6284
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3773
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5417
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5763
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5046
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3149
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3149
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3149
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3149
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3149
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3149
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 3148
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2612
|
Senate
|
05/18/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2011
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
Journal Page: 2217
|
Senate
|
05/11/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2217
|
Senate
|
05/11/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2199
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3830
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3333
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#904
|
Journal Page: 3332
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3332
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3332
|
House
|
05/09/2011
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 3256
|
House
|
05/09/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3256
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2011
|
Transferred to Calendars Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2011
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2011
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2323
|
House
|
04/18/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2011
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2011
|
Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 851
|
House
|
03/17/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 851
|
House
|
03/10/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|