Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB289 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Jackson, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Nelson) H.B. No. 289
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 11, 2011;
 April 20, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Criminal Justice; May 19, 2011, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 19, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to activity that constitutes maintaining a common
 nuisance.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 125.0015(a), Civil Practice and Remedies
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (a)  A person who maintains a place to which persons
 habitually go for the following purposes and who knowingly
 tolerates the activity and furthermore fails to make reasonable
 attempts to abate the activity maintains a common nuisance:
 (1)  discharge of a firearm in a public place as
 prohibited by the Penal Code;
 (2)  reckless discharge of a firearm as prohibited by
 the Penal Code;
 (3)  engaging in organized criminal activity as a
 member of a combination as prohibited by the Penal Code;
 (4)  delivery, possession, manufacture, or use of a
 controlled substance in violation of Chapter 481, Health and Safety
 Code;
 (5)  gambling, gambling promotion, or communicating
 gambling information as prohibited by the Penal Code;
 (6)  prostitution, promotion of prostitution, or
 aggravated promotion of prostitution as prohibited by the Penal
 Code;
 (7)  compelling prostitution as prohibited by the Penal
 Code;
 (8)  commercial manufacture, commercial distribution,
 or commercial exhibition of obscene material as prohibited by the
 Penal Code;
 (9)  aggravated assault as described by Section 22.02,
 Penal Code;
 (10)  sexual assault as described by Section 22.011,
 Penal Code;
 (11)  aggravated sexual assault as described by Section
 22.021, Penal Code;
 (12)  robbery as described by Section 29.02, Penal
 Code;
 (13)  aggravated robbery as described by Section 29.03,
 Penal Code;
 (14)  unlawfully carrying a weapon as described by
 Section 46.02, Penal Code;
 (15)  murder as described by Section 19.02, Penal Code;
 (16)  capital murder as described by Section 19.03,
 Penal Code;
 (17)  continuous sexual abuse of young child or
 children as described by Section 21.02, Penal Code; [or]
 (18)  massage therapy or other massage services in
 violation of Chapter 455, Occupations Code;
 (19)  employing a minor at a sexually oriented business
 as defined by Section 243.002, Local Government Code;
 (20)  trafficking of persons as described by Section
 20A.02, Penal Code;
 (21)  sexual conduct or performance by a child as
 described by Section 43.25, Penal Code; or
 (22)  employment harmful to a child as described by
 Section 43.251, Penal Code.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to a cause of action that accrues on or after the effective date of
 this Act. A cause of action that accrues before the effective date
 of this Act is governed by the law in effect immediately before that
 date, and that law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *