Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2611
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2011
|
Referred to Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 2145
|
Senate
|
05/09/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2145
|
Senate
|
05/06/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2056
|
House
|
05/06/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3202
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#722
|
Journal Page: 2945
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2945
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2945
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2935
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Amended
|
1-Thompson
|
Journal Page: 2935
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2935
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1835
|
House
|
04/06/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2011
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2011
|
Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 852
|
House
|
03/17/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 852
|
House
|
03/10/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|