E
|
06/17/2011
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6919
|
E
|
05/25/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5964
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3430
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5382
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5763
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5040
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3027
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3027
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3027
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3027
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3027
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3027
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 3027
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2710
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2011
|
Referred to Economic Development
|
|
Journal Page: 2188
|
Senate
|
05/10/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2188
|
Senate
|
05/05/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1767
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3178
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#690
|
Journal Page: 2837
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2837
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2837
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2758
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Amended
|
1-Martinez
|
Journal Page: 2757
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2757
|
House
|
05/02/2011
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2264
|
House
|
04/18/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2011
|
Referred to Land & Resource Management
|
|
Journal Page: 852
|
House
|
03/17/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 852
|
House
|
03/10/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|