E
|
06/17/2011
|
Effective on 9/1/11
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6919
|
E
|
05/30/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6917
|
Senate
|
05/29/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5117
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6869
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6916
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3717
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5677
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1493
|
Journal Page: 5677
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5677
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5388
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3329
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3329
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3329
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3329
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3329
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3329
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3329
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2552
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2011
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 2145
|
Senate
|
05/09/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2145
|
Senate
|
05/06/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2056
|
House
|
05/06/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3202
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#722
|
Journal Page: 2945
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2945
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2945
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2942
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
1-Zerwas
|
Journal Page: 2942
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Vote reconsidered
|
1-Zerwas
|
Journal Page: 2942
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2936
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Amended
|
1-Zerwas
|
Journal Page: 2936
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2936
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2796
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Referred to Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 2002
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Correction in referral
|
|
Journal Page: 2002
|
House
|
03/17/2011
|
Referred to Public Health
|
|
Journal Page: 852
|
House
|
03/17/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 852
|
House
|
03/10/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|