Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB2908 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Branch, S. Davis of Harris H.B. No. 2908
 (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 26, 2011;
 April 29, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on Higher
 Education; May 12, 2011, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 12, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to providing graduate medical education positions for
 Texas medical school graduates.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 61.051, Education Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (a-4) to read as follows:
 (a-4)  The board shall include in the five-year master plan
 developed under Subsection (a-1) an assessment of the adequacy of
 opportunities for graduates of medical schools in this state to
 enter graduate medical education in this state. The assessment
 must:
 (1)  compare the number of first-year graduate medical
 education positions available annually with the number of medical
 school graduates;
 (2)  include a statistical analysis of recent trends in
 and projections of the number of medical school graduates and
 first-year graduate medical education positions in this state;
 (3)  develop methods and strategies for achieving a
 ratio for the number of first-year graduate medical education
 positions to the number of medical school graduates in this state of
 at least 1.1 to 1;
 (4)  evaluate current and projected physician
 workforce needs of this state, by total number and by specialty, in
 the development of additional first-year graduate medical
 education positions; and
 (5)  examine whether this state should ensure that a
 first-year graduate medical education position is created in this
 state for each new medical student position established by a
 medical and dental unit.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *