House | 04/28/2011 | Meeting cancelled | ||
House | 04/28/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/27/2011 | No action taken in committee | ||
House | 04/27/2011 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | ||
House | 04/13/2011 | Referred to Government Efficiency & Reform | Journal Page: 1765 | |
House | 04/13/2011 | Correction in referral | Journal Page: 1765 | |
House | 03/17/2011 | Referred to Appropriations | Journal Page: 856 | |
House | 03/17/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 856 | |
House | 03/10/2011 | Filed |