House | 05/09/2011 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 3294 | |
House | 05/09/2011 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB 1478 | Journal Page: 3294 |
House | 05/09/2011 | Postponed | 5/9/11 6:00 PM | Journal Page: 3229 |
House | 05/09/2011 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 3228 | |
House | 05/06/2011 | Postponed | 5/9/11 8:00 AM | Journal Page: 3133 |
House | 05/06/2011 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 3133 | |
House | 05/03/2011 | Postponed | 5/6/11 8:00 AM | Journal Page: 2757 |
House | 05/03/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2757 | |
House | 05/02/2011 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/28/2011 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/18/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/15/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/15/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1909 | |
House | 04/06/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/06/2011 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/06/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/30/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/30/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/30/2011 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/30/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/30/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/17/2011 | Referred to Energy Resources | Journal Page: 857 | |
House | 03/17/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 857 | |
House | 03/10/2011 | Filed |