E
|
06/17/2011
|
Effective on 9/1/11
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6917
|
E
|
05/30/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6916
|
Senate
|
05/29/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5116
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6869
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6915
|
Senate
|
05/26/2011
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3995
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5859
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5860
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1532
|
Journal Page: 5859
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5859
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5396
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3448
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3448
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3448
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3448
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3448
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3448
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 3448
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Corrected comm. report printed & distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 3320
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2011
|
Referred to Criminal Justice
|
|
Journal Page: 1600
|
Senate
|
04/29/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1600
|
Senate
|
04/26/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1294
|
House
|
04/25/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2264
|
House
|
04/21/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2153
|
House
|
04/21/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#507
|
Journal Page: 2153
|
House
|
04/21/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2153
|
House
|
04/21/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2153
|
House
|
04/20/2011
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2073
|
House
|
04/20/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2073
|
House
|
04/20/2011
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1866
|
House
|
04/07/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2011
|
Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 777
|
House
|
03/14/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 777
|
House
|
03/10/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|