Senate | 05/12/2011 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 2266 | |
Senate | 05/12/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2266 | |
Senate | 05/12/2011 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2238 | |
House | 05/12/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3968 | |
House | 05/11/2011 | Record vote | RV#963 | Journal Page: 3554 |
House | 05/11/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 3554 | |
House | 05/11/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3554 | |
House | 05/10/2011 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 3417 | |
House | 05/10/2011 | Amended | 4-Madden | Journal Page: 3414 |
House | 05/10/2011 | Amendment withdrawn | 3-Villarreal | Journal Page: 3411 |
House | 05/10/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3411 | |
House | 05/06/2011 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/04/2011 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/28/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/27/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/27/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2390 | |
House | 04/26/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/26/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/05/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/05/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/05/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/05/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/17/2011 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 860 | |
House | 03/17/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 860 | |
House | 03/10/2011 | Filed |