House | 05/09/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/09/2011 | Vote reconsidered in committee | ||
House | 05/09/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/05/2011 | Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm. | ||
House | 05/05/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/19/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/19/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/19/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/19/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/17/2011 | Referred to Public Education | Journal Page: 862 | |
House | 03/17/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 862 | |
House | 03/10/2011 | Filed |