Senate | 05/12/2011 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | Journal Page: 2266 | |
Senate | 05/12/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2266 | |
Senate | 05/12/2011 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2238 | |
House | 05/12/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3968 | |
House | 05/11/2011 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3583 | |
House | 05/11/2011 | Record vote | RV#970 | Journal Page: 3582 |
House | 05/11/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 3582 | |
House | 05/11/2011 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 3582 | |
House | 05/10/2011 | Postponed | 5/11/11 6:59 AM | Journal Page: 3393 |
House | 05/10/2011 | Vote reconsidered | Journal Page: 3393 | |
House | 05/10/2011 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3334 | |
House | 05/10/2011 | Record vote | RV#906 | Journal Page: 3334 |
House | 05/10/2011 | Failed to pass | Journal Page: 3334 | |
House | 05/10/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3334 | |
House | 05/09/2011 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3257 | |
House | 05/09/2011 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 3257 | |
House | 05/09/2011 | Amended | 1-Phillips | Journal Page: 3256 |
House | 05/09/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3256 | |
House | 05/05/2011 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/03/2011 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/02/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/02/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/02/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2797 | |
House | 04/21/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/21/2011 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/21/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/18/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/18/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/18/2011 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/18/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/18/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/17/2011 | Referred to Ways & Means | Journal Page: 862 | |
House | 03/17/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 862 | |
House | 03/10/2011 | Filed |