Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB3065 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Sheffield (Senate Sponsor - Nichols) H.B. No. 3065
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 26, 2011;
 April 29, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on Health
 and Human Services; May 11, 2011, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 11, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the requirement that certain food service
 establishments post a sign depicting the Heimlich maneuver.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter E, Chapter 438, Health and Safety
 Code, is repealed.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *