Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB3096 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Kolkhorst (Senate Sponsor - Carona) H.B. No. 3096
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 5, 2011;
 May 9, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Intergovernmental Relations; May 19, 2011, reported favorably by
 the following vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 19, 2011, sent to
 printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the cancellation of a subdivision by a commissioners
 court.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 232.008(h), Local Government Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (h)  Regardless of the date land is subdivided or a plat is
 filed for a subdivision, the [The] commissioners court may deny a
 cancellation under this section if the commissioners court
 determines the cancellation will prevent the proposed
 interconnection of infrastructure to pending or existing
 development as defined by Section 232.0085.
 SECTION 2.  Section 232.008(h), Local Government Code, as
 amended by this Act, applies to an application for cancellation of
 all or part of a subdivision filed on or after the effective date of
 this Act or before the effective date of this Act if the approval of
 the application filed before the effective date of this Act is not
 final.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *