House | 04/12/2011 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 1677 | |
House | 04/12/2011 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB 333 | Journal Page: 1677 |
House | 04/05/2011 | Postponed | 4/12/11 10:00 AM | Journal Page: 1492 |
House | 04/05/2011 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 1492 | |
House | 03/31/2011 | Postponed | 4/5/11 10:00 AM | Journal Page: 1162 |
House | 03/31/2011 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 1161 | |
House | 03/30/2011 | Postponed | 3/31/11 8:30 AM | Journal Page: 1135 |
House | 03/30/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1135 | |
House | 03/30/2011 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 03/28/2011 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 03/14/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/11/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/11/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 790 | |
House | 03/08/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/08/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/01/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/01/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/01/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/01/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/15/2011 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 358 | |
House | 02/15/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 358 | |
House | 11/17/2010 | Filed |