E
|
06/17/2011
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6919
|
E
|
05/30/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6917
|
Senate
|
05/29/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5117
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6869
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6916
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3717
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5541
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1462
|
Journal Page: 5541
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5541
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5040
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3051
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3051
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3051
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3051
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3050
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3050
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
|
Journal Page: 3050
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA4 Seliger
|
Journal Page: 3049
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Point of order withdrawn
|
|
Journal Page: 3049
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Point of order
|
|
Journal Page: 3049
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Amendment adopted as amended
|
FA1 Seliger
|
Journal Page: 3048
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Amendment amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3048
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Amendment to amendment offered
|
FA2 Uresti
|
Journal Page: 3048
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3037
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 3037
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2612
|
Senate
|
05/18/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2506
|
Senate
|
05/12/2011
|
Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
|
|
Journal Page: 2266
|
Senate
|
05/12/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2266
|
Senate
|
05/12/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2238
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3968
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3542
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#950
|
Journal Page: 3542
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3542
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3542
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 3535
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3535
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2011
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3092
|
House
|
05/02/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2011
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2011
|
Referred to Urban Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 868
|
House
|
03/18/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 868
|
House
|
03/10/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|