E
|
06/17/2011
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6919
|
E
|
05/30/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6917
|
Senate
|
05/29/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5117
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6869
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6916
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3717
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5709
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5710
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1506
|
Journal Page: 5709
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5709
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5392
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3376
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3376
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3376
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3376
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3375
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3375
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Van de Putte
|
Journal Page: 3375
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3375
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3375
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 3375
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2976
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2656
|
Senate
|
05/11/2011
|
Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
|
|
Journal Page: 2217
|
Senate
|
05/11/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2217
|
Senate
|
05/11/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2199
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3830
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3335
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#907
|
Journal Page: 3335
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3335
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3335
|
House
|
05/09/2011
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3257
|
House
|
05/09/2011
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 3257
|
House
|
05/09/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3257
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2797
|
House
|
04/20/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2011
|
Referred to Ways & Means
|
|
Journal Page: 870
|
House
|
03/18/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 870
|
House
|
03/10/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|