Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB3145 Compare Versions

The same version is selected twice. Please select two different versions to compare.
OldNewDifferences
11 By: Naishtat, Perry (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini) H.B. No. 3145
22 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 6, 2011;
33 May 9, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on Health
44 and Human Services; May 18, 2011, reported favorably by the
55 following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 18, 2011, sent to printer.)
66
77
88 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
99 AN ACT
1010 relating to the regulation of chemical dependency counselors.
1111 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1212 SECTION 1. Section 467.004(a), Health and Safety Code, is
1313 amended to read as follows:
1414 (a) Except as provided by Section 467.0041(b) of this code
1515 and Section 504.058, Occupations Code, a licensing or disciplinary
1616 authority may add a surcharge of not more than $10 to its license or
1717 license renewal fee to fund an approved peer assistance program.
1818 The authority must adopt the surcharge in accordance with the
1919 procedure that the authority uses to initiate and adopt an increase
2020 in its license or license renewal fee.
2121 SECTION 2. Section 504.002(b), Occupations Code, is amended
2222 to read as follows:
2323 (b) This chapter does not apply to an activity or service of
2424 a person who:
2525 (1) is employed as a counselor by a federal
2626 institution and is providing chemical dependency counseling within
2727 the scope of the person's employment;
2828 (2) except as provided by Section 504.1515, is a
2929 student, intern, or trainee pursuing a supervised course of study
3030 in counseling at a regionally accredited institution of higher
3131 education or training institution, if the person:
3232 (A) is designated as a "counselor intern"; and
3333 (B) is engaging in the activity or providing the
3434 service as part of the course of study;
3535 (3) is not a resident of this state, if the person:
3636 (A) engages in the activity or provides the
3737 service in this state for not more than 30 days during any year; and
3838 (B) is authorized to engage in the activity or
3939 provide the service under the law of the state of the person's
4040 residence;
4141 (4) is a licensed physician, psychologist,
4242 professional counselor, or social worker;
4343 (5) is a religious leader of a congregation providing
4444 pastoral chemical dependency counseling within the scope of the
4545 person's duties;
4646 (6) is working for or providing counseling with a
4747 program exempt under Subchapter C, Chapter 464, Health and Safety
4848 Code; [or]
4949 (7) is a school counselor certified by the State Board
5050 for Educator Certification; or
5151 (8) provides chemical dependency counseling through a
5252 program or in a facility that receives funding from the Texas
5353 Department of Criminal Justice and who is credentialed as:
5454 (A) a certified criminal justice addictions
5555 professional by the International Certification and Reciprocity
5656 Consortium; or
5757 (B) having certified criminal justice
5858 professional applicant status issued by the Texas Certification
5959 Board of Addiction Professionals.
6060 SECTION 3. Subchapter B, Chapter 504, Occupations Code, is
6161 amended by adding Section 504.058 to read as follows:
6262 Sec. 504.058. FUNDING FOR CHEMICAL DEPENDENCY COUNSELOR
6363 PROGRAMS. (a) The executive commissioner shall add a surcharge of
6464 not more than $10 to the license or license renewal fee for a
6565 license under this chapter to fund approved peer assistance
6666 programs for chemical dependency counselors. Money collected from
6767 the surcharge shall be remitted to the comptroller for deposit to
6868 the credit of the chemical dependency counselor account. The
6969 chemical dependency counselor account is an account in the general
7070 revenue fund.
7171 (b) Subject to the General Appropriations Act, the
7272 department may use the money from the surcharge collected under
7373 this section and deposited in the chemical dependency counselor
7474 account only to fund approved peer assistance programs and to pay
7575 the administrative costs incurred by the department that are
7676 related to the programs.
7777 SECTION 4. Section 504.152, Occupations Code, is amended to
7878 read as follows:
7979 Sec. 504.152. ELIGIBILITY REQUIREMENTS. (a) To be
8080 eligible for a license under this chapter, a person must:
8181 (1) be at least 18 years of age;
8282 (2) hold an associate degree or a more advanced
8383 degree;
8484 (3) have completed:
8585 (A) 135 hours, or nine semester hours, specific
8686 to substance abuse disorders and treatment and an additional 135
8787 hours, or nine semester hours, specific or related to chemical
8888 dependency counseling;
8989 (B) 4,000 hours of approved supervised
9090 experience working with chemically dependent persons; and
9191 (C) 300 hours of approved supervised field work
9292 practicum;
9393 (4) provide two letters of reference from chemical
9494 dependency counselors;
9595 (5) pass a written examination approved by the
9696 department;
9797 (6) submit a case presentation to the test
9898 administrator;
9999 (7) [pass an oral examination approved by the
100100 department;
101101 [(8)] be determined by the department to be worthy of
102102 the public trust and confidence;
103103 (8) [(9)] successfully complete the chemical
104104 dependency counselor examination under Section 504.156;
105105 (9) [(10)] sign a written agreement to comply with the
106106 standards of ethics approved by the department; and
107107 (10) [(11)] provide to the department written
108108 assurance that the applicant has access to a peer assistance
109109 program.
110110 (b) The department may waive the requirement under
111111 Subsection (a)(10) [(a)(11)] if the department determines that a
112112 peer assistance program is not reasonably available to the license
113113 holder.
114114 SECTION 5. Sections 504.1525(a) and (b), Occupations Code,
115115 are amended to read as follows:
116116 (a) Except as provided by Subsection (b), the department may
117117 not issue a license, registration, or certification under this
118118 chapter to an applicant who has been:
119119 (1) convicted or placed on community supervision
120120 during the three [five] years preceding the date of application in
121121 any jurisdiction for an offense equal to a Class B misdemeanor
122122 specified by executive commissioner rule;
123123 (2) convicted or placed on community supervision in
124124 any jurisdiction for an offense equal to or greater than a Class A
125125 misdemeanor specified by executive commissioner rule; or
126126 (3) found to be incapacitated by a court on the basis
127127 of a mental defect or disease.
128128 (b) The department may issue a license, registration, or
129129 certification to a person convicted or placed on community
130130 supervision in any jurisdiction for a drug or alcohol offense
131131 described by Subsection (a)(1) or (2) if the department determines
132132 that the applicant has successfully completed participation in an
133133 approved peer assistance program.
134134 SECTION 6. (a) The executive commissioner of the Health and
135135 Human Services Commission shall adopt rules to implement the
136136 changes in law made by this Act not later than December 1, 2011.
137137 (b) Section 504.058, Occupations Code, as added by this Act,
138138 and Sections 504.152 and 504.1525, Occupations Code, as amended by
139139 this Act, apply only to an application for an original or renewal
140140 license, registration, or certification submitted to the
141141 Department of State Health Services on or after December 1, 2011. An
142142 application submitted before December 1, 2011, is governed by the
143143 law in effect on the date the application was submitted, and the
144144 former law is continued in effect for that purpose.
145145 SECTION 7. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
146146 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
147147 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
148148 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
149149 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
150150 * * * * *