House | 05/02/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/29/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/29/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2657 | |
House | 04/28/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/28/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/26/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/26/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/26/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/26/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/18/2011 | Referred to Environmental Regulation | Journal Page: 873 | |
House | 03/18/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 873 | |
House | 03/10/2011 | Filed |