Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB3261 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            82R9484 T
 By: Strama H.B. No. 3261


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the establishment of the Texas High Performance Schools
 Consortium.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 7.0561, Education Code, is added to read
 as follows:
 Sec. 7.0561.  TEXAS HIGH PERFORMANCE SCHOOLS CONSORTIUM.
 (a) The Texas High Performance Schools Consortium is created for
 the purpose of informing the governor, legislature, and
 commissioner about ways to transform public schools to improve
 student learning through the development of innovative,
 next-generation learning standards and assessment and
 accountability systems.
 (b)  One or more school districts, up to a maximum of 20, may
 apply to the commissioner to be included in the consortium of school
 districts.  The districts selected shall include a representative
 range of district types and sizes and diverse student populations.
 The commissioner may select upon application an exemplary
 open-enrollment charter school to participate in the consortium.
 (c)  The commissioner may waive one or more requirements,
 restrictions, or prohibitions under
 (1)  Subchapter B, Chapter 28;
 (2)  Sections 31.1011 and 31.073(b)(1) (state textbook
 credits); and
 (3)  Chapter 39.
 (d)  With input from interested school districts and other
 stakeholders, the commissioner shall adopt rules to create the
 consortium, according to the following principles for a next
 generation of higher performing public schools:
 (1)  engagement of students in digital learning,
 including the use of electronic textbooks and instructional
 materials adopted under Subchapters B and B-1, Chapter 31, and
 courses offered through the state virtual school network under
 Subchapter 30A;
 (2)  emphasis on learning standards that focus on
 high–priority "power standards" identified in coordination with
 districts participating in the consortium;
 (3)  use of multiple assessments for learning that have
 meaning and importance and that continuously inform students,
 parents, campuses, and districts about the extent to which learning
 is occurring and what schools are doing to improve;
 (4)  an effective and efficient accountability system
 that:
 (A)  balances academic excellence and local
 values to inspire learning; and
 (B)  at the state level, uses a stratified random
 sampling of students or other objective methodology to hold
 districts and schools accountable while reducing the number of
 state assessments that students are required to take; and
 (5)  local control that enables communities and parents
 to be involved in the important decisions regarding the education
 of their children.
 (e)  The application shall include a detailed plan for
 assessments and accountability, which will both support improved
 instruction and learning and provide evidence of the accurate
 evaluation of the quality of the campuses, and which shall include:
 (1)  a thorough plan for accountability for student
 learning, including issues regarding compliance with federal law;
 (2)  clear descriptions of each assessed curricular aim
 in the "power standards";
 (3)  a plan for resources to support teachers in
 improving student learning; and
 (4)  other provisions that may be established by the
 commissioner.
 (f)  The commissioner shall convene consortium leaders
 periodically to discuss ways to transform learning opportunities
 for all students, build cross-district support systems and
 training, and share best practice tools and processes.
 (g)  The commissioner or a school district that participates
 in the consortium may accept gifts, grants, or donations from any
 source, including a foundation, private entity, or governmental
 entity for the implementation of this section.
 (h)  To cover administration costs, the commissioner may
 charge a fee to a school district or open-enrollment charter school
 that is selected to participate in the consortium.
 SECTION 2.  (a)  The commissioner shall adopt rules under
 Section 7.0561, Education Code, as added by this Act, not later than
 December 1, 2011.  The commissioner shall seek a federal waiver, if
 needed, for implementation.
 (b)  The commissioner shall make the application available
 not later than January 1, 2012, for school districts to apply not
 later than March 1, 2012 and to begin the consortium not later than
 the 2012-13 school year.
 (c)  With the assistance of the consortium, the commissioner
 shall submit progress reports to the Legislature by December 1,
 2012, and December 1, 2014.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.