E
|
06/17/2011
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6919
|
E
|
05/30/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6917
|
Senate
|
05/30/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5141
|
House
|
05/30/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6913
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6916
|
Senate
|
05/28/2011
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4564
|
Senate
|
05/28/2011
|
House discharges conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4564
|
House
|
05/28/2011
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 6364
|
House
|
05/28/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 6365
|
House
|
05/28/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1645
|
Journal Page: 6364
|
House
|
05/28/2011
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 6364
|
House
|
05/28/2011
|
House discharges conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 6364
|
Senate
|
05/26/2011
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3799
|
Senate
|
05/26/2011
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3799
|
Senate
|
05/26/2011
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3799
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 5784
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 5784
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 5784
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5042
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3064
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3064
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3064
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3064
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3064
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3064
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3064
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Estes
|
Journal Page: 3064
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3064
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 3064
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2710
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 2373
|
Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2373
|
Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2320
|
House
|
05/15/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 4064
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1103
|
Journal Page: 3962
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3962
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3962
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Rules suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3960
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 3733
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3733
|
House
|
05/09/2011
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2657
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2011
|
Referred to Environmental Regulation
|
|
Journal Page: 880
|
House
|
03/18/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 880
|
House
|
03/11/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|