Senate
|
05/30/2011
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5120
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 6659
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1714
|
Journal Page: 6659
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 6650
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
House adopts resolution to go outside bounds
|
HR2654
|
Journal Page: 6647
|
House
|
05/28/2011
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2011
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 4591
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6277
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6277
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 4064
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
Senate grants request for conference comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 4063
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3718
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3718
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3718
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 5597
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 5597
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 5597
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5382
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3311
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3311
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3311
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3311
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3310
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3310
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
|
Journal Page: 3310
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA4 Seliger
|
Journal Page: 3310
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Amendment tabled
|
|
Journal Page: 3310
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3308
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3303
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 3303
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2710
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2011
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2549
|
Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
Referred to Economic Development
|
|
Journal Page: 2373
|
Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2373
|
Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2321
|
House
|
05/15/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 4064
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1073
|
Journal Page: 3908
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3908
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3908
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3786
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 3786
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3786
|
House
|
05/10/2011
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3178
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2011
|
No action taken in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2011
|
Referred to Ways & Means
|
|
Journal Page: 881
|
House
|
03/18/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 881
|
House
|
03/11/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|