Texas 2011 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB328 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Guillen (Senate Sponsor - Zaffirini) H.B. No. 328
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 11, 2011;
 April 20, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Government Organization; May 5, 2011, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 5, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to information provided to a person applying for a state
 tax permit or license.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 111.00457(a), Tax Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (a)  The comptroller shall include the following statement
 on each application for a permit or license issued by the
 comptroller:
 WARNING.  You may be required to obtain an additional permit
 or license from the State of Texas or from a local governmental
 entity to conduct business.  A listing of links relating to
 acquiring licenses, permits, and registrations from the State of
 Texas is available online at http://www.Texas.gov
 [http://www.TexasOnline.com/portal/tol/en/9/1].  You may also want
 to contact the municipality and county in which you will conduct
 business to determine any local governmental requirements.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *