House | 05/11/2011 | Postponed | 9/27/11 8:00 AM | Journal Page: 3575 |
House | 05/11/2011 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 3575 | |
House | 05/10/2011 | Postponed | 5/11/11 8:00 AM | Journal Page: 3395 |
House | 05/10/2011 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 3395 | |
House | 05/10/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3325 | |
House | 05/09/2011 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3226 | |
House | 05/09/2011 | Record vote | RV#860 | Journal Page: 3225 |
House | 05/09/2011 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 3225 | |
House | 05/09/2011 | Amended | 2-Fletcher | Journal Page: 3225 |
House | 05/09/2011 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 3224 | |
House | 05/07/2011 | Postponed | 5/9/11 7:00 AM | Journal Page: 3191 |
House | 05/07/2011 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 3191 | |
House | 05/06/2011 | Postponed | 5/7/11 7:00 AM | Journal Page: 3137 |
House | 05/06/2011 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 3137 | |
House | 05/05/2011 | Postponed | 5/6/11 8:00 AM | Journal Page: 3083 |
House | 05/05/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3082 | |
House | 05/05/2011 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/03/2011 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/03/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/02/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/02/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2796 | |
House | 04/27/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/27/2011 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/27/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/13/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/13/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/13/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/13/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/18/2011 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 884 | |
House | 03/18/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 884 | |
House | 03/11/2011 | Filed |