Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB3309 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Rodriguez (Senate Sponsor - Nichols) H.B. No. 3309
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 4, 2011;
 May 5, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation and Homeland Security; May 17, 2011, reported
 favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 17, 2011, sent
 to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the authority to set maximum weights for state
 highways, roads, and bridges.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 621.102, Transportation Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 Sec. 621.102.  [COMMISSION'S] AUTHORITY TO SET MAXIMUM
 WEIGHTS.  (a)  The director [commission] may set the maximum single
 axle weight, tandem axle weight, or gross weight of a vehicle, or
 maximum single axle weight, tandem axle weight, or gross weight of a
 combination of vehicles and loads, that may be moved over a state
 highway or a farm or ranch road if the director [commission] finds
 that heavier maximum weight would rapidly deteriorate or destroy
 the road or a bridge or culvert along the road. A maximum weight set
 under this subsection may not exceed the maximum set by statute for
 that weight.
 (b)  [The commission must set a maximum weight under this
 section by order entered in its minutes.
 [(c)]  The director [commission] must make the finding under
 this section on an engineering and traffic investigation and in
 making the finding shall consider the width, condition, and type of
 pavement structures and other circumstances on the road.
 (c) [(d)]  A maximum weight or load set under this section
 becomes effective on a highway or road when appropriate signs
 giving notice of the maximum weight or load are erected on the
 highway or road [under order of the commission].
 (d) [(e)]  A vehicle operating under a permit issued under
 Section 623.011, 623.071, 623.094, 623.121, 623.142, 623.181,
 623.192, or 623.212 may operate under the conditions authorized by
 the permit over a road for which the director [commission] has set a
 maximum weight under this section.
 (e) [(f)]  For the purpose of this section, a farm or ranch
 road is a state highway that is shown in the records of the
 commission to be a farm-to-market or ranch-to-market road.
 (f) [(g)]  This section does not apply to a vehicle
 delivering groceries, farm products, or liquefied petroleum gas.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *