Texas 2011 - 82nd Regular

Texas House Bill HB3314 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Carter (Senate Sponsor - Nelson) H.B. No. 3314
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 26, 2011;
 April 29, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Jurisprudence; May 18, 2011, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 18, 2011, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to a requirement that an attorney ad litem appointed for a
 child file a statement with the court regarding the attorney ad
 litem's meeting with the child or other specified person.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 107.004(d), Family Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (d)  Except as provided by Subsection (e), an attorney ad
 litem appointed for a child in a proceeding under Chapter 262 or 263
 shall:
 (1)  meet before each court hearing with:
 (A) [(1)]  the child, if the child is at least
 four years of age; or
 (B) [(2)]  the individual with whom the child
 ordinarily resides, including the child's parent, conservator,
 guardian, caretaker, or custodian, if the child is younger than
 four years of age; and
 (2)  if the child or individual is not present at the
 court hearing, file a written statement with the court indicating
 that the attorney ad litem complied with Subdivision (1).
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2011.
 * * * * *