E
|
06/17/2011
|
Effective on 9/1/11
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6919
|
E
|
05/31/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6917
|
Senate
|
05/31/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5148
|
House
|
05/31/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6913
|
House
|
05/30/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6916
|
Senate
|
05/30/2011
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5120
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 6860
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 6861
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1738
|
Journal Page: 6861
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 6858
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6872
|
Senate
|
05/29/2011
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 5072
|
House
|
05/28/2011
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2011
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 4749
|
House
|
05/28/2011
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6458
|
House
|
05/28/2011
|
Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6458
|
Senate
|
05/28/2011
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 4576
|
Senate
|
05/28/2011
|
Senate grants request for conference comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 4575
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4347
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4347
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4347
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 6206
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 6206
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 6206
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5762
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3612
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3612
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3612
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3612
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3612
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3612
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3611
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA6 Hegar
|
Journal Page: 3595
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Amendment tabled
|
|
Journal Page: 3595
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Amendment fails of adoption
|
|
Journal Page: 3592
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3591
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 3591
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 3320
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 2610
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2011
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 2307
|
Senate
|
05/13/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2307
|
Senate
|
05/13/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2274
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3968
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3672
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#989
|
Journal Page: 3672
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3672
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3672
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3586
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3585
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3585
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Amendment adopted as amended
|
1-Parker
|
Journal Page: 3585
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Amendment amended
|
2-Burnam
|
Journal Page: 3585
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
1-Parker
|
Journal Page: 3584
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3584
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Placed on Major State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3201
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2011
|
Referred to Energy Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 885
|
House
|
03/18/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 885
|
House
|
03/11/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|