Senate | 05/13/2011 | Referred to Economic Development | Journal Page: 2307 | |
Senate | 05/13/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2307 | |
Senate | 05/13/2011 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2274 | |
House | 05/12/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3968 | |
House | 05/12/2011 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3684 | |
House | 05/12/2011 | Record vote | RV#997 | Journal Page: 3683 |
House | 05/12/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 3683 | |
House | 05/12/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3683 | |
House | 05/11/2011 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3591 | |
House | 05/11/2011 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 3591 | |
House | 05/11/2011 | Amended | 1-Murphy | Journal Page: 3590 |
House | 05/11/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3590 | |
House | 05/06/2011 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/04/2011 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/03/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/02/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/02/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2797 | |
House | 04/21/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/21/2011 | Vote reconsidered in committee | ||
House | 04/21/2011 | Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm. | ||
House | 04/21/2011 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/21/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/04/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/04/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/04/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/04/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/18/2011 | Referred to Ways & Means | Journal Page: 886 | |
House | 03/18/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 886 | |
House | 03/11/2011 | Filed |