E
|
06/17/2011
|
Vetoed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6919
|
E
|
05/30/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6916
|
Senate
|
05/30/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5140
|
House
|
05/30/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6913
|
House
|
05/30/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6916
|
|
05/30/2011
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 6864
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1739
|
Journal Page: 6863
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 6861
|
House
|
05/29/2011
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6873
|
Senate
|
05/29/2011
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 5082
|
House
|
05/28/2011
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2011
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 5039
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6283
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6283
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 4338
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
Senate grants request for conference comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 4338
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4085
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4085
|
Senate
|
05/27/2011
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4085
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 6038
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 6038
|
House
|
05/27/2011
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 6038
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5759
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3573
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3573
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3573
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 3573
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3432
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3432
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA3 Ellis
|
Journal Page: 3432
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3432
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3431
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3430
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 3430
|
Senate
|
05/21/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2710
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2582
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 2610
|
Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 2371
|
Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2371
|
Senate
|
05/13/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2272
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3968
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3697
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1012
|
Journal Page: 3696
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3696
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3696
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3620
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Amended
|
1-Shelton
|
Journal Page: 3620
|
House
|
05/11/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3620
|
House
|
05/07/2011
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1374
|
House
|
03/29/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2011
|
Vote reconsidered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2011
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2011
|
Referred to State Sovereignty, Select
|
|
Journal Page: 360
|
House
|
02/15/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 360
|
House
|
11/22/2010
|
Filed
|
|
|