House | 05/06/2011 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 3136 | |
House | 05/06/2011 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB 1680 | Journal Page: 3136 |
House | 05/06/2011 | Postponed | 5/6/11 2:00 PM | Journal Page: 3133 |
House | 05/06/2011 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 3133 | |
House | 05/04/2011 | Postponed | 5/6/11 7:30 AM | Journal Page: 2895 |
House | 05/04/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2895 | |
House | 05/04/2011 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/02/2011 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/19/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/18/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/18/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2006 | |
House | 04/14/2011 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/14/2011 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/14/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/29/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/29/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/29/2011 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/29/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/29/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/18/2011 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 889 | |
House | 03/18/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 889 | |
House | 03/11/2011 | Filed |