E
|
06/17/2011
|
Effective on 9/1/11
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6919
|
E
|
05/26/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6284
|
Senate
|
05/25/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3773
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5417
|
House
|
05/24/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5764
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3338
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4959
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1324
|
Journal Page: 4959
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4959
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4614
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2648
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2648
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2648
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2648
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2648
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2648
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2648
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Seliger
|
Journal Page: 2648
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2648
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2648
|
Senate
|
05/19/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2011
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2552
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2011
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 2145
|
Senate
|
05/09/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2145
|
Senate
|
05/06/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2058
|
House
|
05/06/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3202
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#760
|
Journal Page: 2980
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2980
|
House
|
05/05/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2980
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2896
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2896
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2896
|
House
|
05/04/2011
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2011
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2011
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2324
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Vote reconsidered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2011
|
Referred to Natural Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 890
|
House
|
03/18/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 890
|
House
|
03/11/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|