1 | 1 | | By: Naishtat (Senate Sponsor - Watson) H.B. No. 3404 |
---|
2 | 2 | | (In the Senate - Received from the House April 26, 2011; |
---|
3 | 3 | | April 29, 2011, read first time and referred to Committee on |
---|
4 | 4 | | Government Organization; May 18, 2011, reported favorably by the |
---|
5 | 5 | | following vote: Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 18, 2011, sent to printer.) |
---|
6 | 6 | | |
---|
7 | 7 | | |
---|
8 | 8 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
9 | 9 | | AN ACT |
---|
10 | 10 | | relating to establishing a child care advisory committee to advise |
---|
11 | 11 | | the Texas Facilities Commission. |
---|
12 | 12 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
13 | 13 | | SECTION 1. Section 663.051, Government Code, is reenacted |
---|
14 | 14 | | and amended to read as follows: |
---|
15 | 15 | | Sec. 663.051. ADVISORY COMMITTEE. (a) The commission |
---|
16 | 16 | | shall appoint a child care advisory committee composed of |
---|
17 | 17 | | individuals who are interested in child care services for state |
---|
18 | 18 | | employees. |
---|
19 | 19 | | (b) The commission may appoint to the committee: |
---|
20 | 20 | | (1) the executive directors of: |
---|
21 | 21 | | (A) the commission; and |
---|
22 | 22 | | (B) the Texas Department of Housing and Community |
---|
23 | 23 | | Affairs; |
---|
24 | 24 | | (2) two representatives of nonprofit organizations |
---|
25 | 25 | | involved with the delivery or support of child care services; |
---|
26 | 26 | | (3) [a representative of the corporate child |
---|
27 | 27 | | development fund; |
---|
28 | 28 | | [(4)] a representative of child care providers; |
---|
29 | 29 | | (4) [(5)] one or more state employees subject to the |
---|
30 | 30 | | state classification plan: |
---|
31 | 31 | | (A) each of whom has at least one child in a child |
---|
32 | 32 | | care facility; and |
---|
33 | 33 | | (B) if more than one is appointed, each of whom |
---|
34 | 34 | | resides in a different geographic area of the state; and |
---|
35 | 35 | | (5) [(6)] one or more individuals knowledgeable in |
---|
36 | 36 | | child care services or the need of working individuals for child |
---|
37 | 37 | | care services. |
---|
38 | 38 | | (c) The committee shall advise the commission on the: |
---|
39 | 39 | | (1) location, size, and design of the child care |
---|
40 | 40 | | facilities; and |
---|
41 | 41 | | (2) curriculum a child care facility must provide to |
---|
42 | 42 | | ensure the provision of developmentally appropriate services of a |
---|
43 | 43 | | high quality. |
---|
44 | 44 | | (d) The committee is abolished and this section expires |
---|
45 | 45 | | September 1, 2021. |
---|
46 | 46 | | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2011. |
---|
47 | 47 | | * * * * * |
---|