Senate | 04/20/2011 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 1275 | |
Senate | 04/20/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1275 | |
Senate | 04/11/2011 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1007 | |
House | 04/08/2011 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1662 | |
House | 04/08/2011 | Record vote | RV#309 | Journal Page: 1607 |
House | 04/08/2011 | Passed | Journal Page: 1607 | |
House | 04/08/2011 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1607 | |
House | 04/07/2011 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1594 | |
House | 04/07/2011 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1594 | |
House | 04/07/2011 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/05/2011 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 03/21/2011 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/17/2011 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/17/2011 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 922 | |
House | 03/16/2011 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/16/2011 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/16/2011 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | ||
House | 02/22/2011 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 02/22/2011 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 02/22/2011 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 02/22/2011 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/15/2011 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 360 | |
House | 02/15/2011 | Read first time | Journal Page: 360 | |
House | 11/22/2010 | Filed |