E
|
06/17/2011
|
Effective on 1/1/12
|
|
|
E
|
06/17/2011
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6919
|
E
|
05/27/2011
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6460
|
Senate
|
05/26/2011
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4013
|
House
|
05/26/2011
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5957
|
House
|
05/25/2011
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5964
|
Senate
|
05/24/2011
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3338
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4964
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4965
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1326
|
Journal Page: 4964
|
House
|
05/23/2011
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4964
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2011
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/20/2011
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4616
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2691
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2691
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2691
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2691
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2690
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2690
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2690
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA1 Duncan
|
Journal Page: 2690
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2690
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2690
|
Senate
|
05/20/2011
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2011
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2011
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2553
|
Senate
|
05/18/2011
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2011
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2506
|
Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 2373
|
Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2373
|
Senate
|
05/16/2011
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2321
|
House
|
05/15/2011
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 4064
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3865
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3863
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Record vote
|
RV#1044
|
Journal Page: 3865
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3865
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3865
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 3838
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3838
|
House
|
05/13/2011
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2011
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2011
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2011
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2011
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2796
|
House
|
04/21/2011
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2011
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2011
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2011
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2011
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2011
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2011
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2011
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2011
|
Referred to Insurance
|
|
Journal Page: 892
|
House
|
03/18/2011
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 892
|
House
|
03/11/2011
|
Filed
|
|
|